U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Request]
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2019: [Request]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.