U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seibel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 14, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.