U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seibel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 03, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Request]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.