U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 03, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 22, 2019: [Request]
  • March 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.