U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laframboise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 28, 2019: [Furlough]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2019: [Request]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.