U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasknetz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Request]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.