U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Star Comes Out
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 01, 2022: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Request]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.