U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hussman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Request]
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Quash]
  • July 01, 2019: [For Order]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.