U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arrendondo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Supplement]
  • December 30, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • September 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 04, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 05, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Suppress]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Request]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.