U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Two Dogs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2022: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 29, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 25, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Competency Report]
  • March 15, 2021: [Sealed Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Memorandum Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Order]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Competency Report]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Competency Evaluation]
  • February 12, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 13, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2019: [Request]
  • April 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arrest]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.