U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonadore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 27, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2021: [Jury List]
  • April 27, 2021: [Jury Trial - Sentence Enhancement Phase]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 23, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 23, 2021: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response]
  • April 19, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • April 19, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2021: [DEACTIVATED_Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • April 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 13, 2021: [Suppress]
  • April 13, 2021: [Objection]
  • April 13, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • April 12, 2021: [For Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • April 01, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 03, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 10, 2020: [Competency Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 16, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Furlough]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 17, 2020: [Joinder]
  • April 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 01, 2020: [Furlough]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 27, 2020: [Release from Custody]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 23, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2019: [Joinder]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Joinder]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 22, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 22, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Request]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.