U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50041
  • Case Name: Cynthia Lynn Spencer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.