U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Waln
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • March 15, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2020: [Extend]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 12, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 18, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extend]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2019: [Request]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.