U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Bear et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Release from Custody]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2019: [Request]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2019: [Request]
  • March 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.