U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Circle Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 21, 2019: [Objection]
  • November 19, 2019: [Furlough]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 15, 2019: [Furlough]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2019: [Request]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Request]
  • March 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.