U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conroy et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • January 23, 2020: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • March 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.