U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medicine Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • February 11, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 25, 2019: [Request]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.