U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50143-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Schrum et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 14, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 17, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 07, 2020: [Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 12, 2020: [Response]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 03, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 23, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • July 23, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2020: [Compel]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Request]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.