U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santistevan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • June 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Verdict]
  • June 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • June 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 05, 2019: [Jury List]
  • June 05, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • June 03, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 03, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 30, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 28, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 18, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 22, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 05, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.