U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-10020
  • Case Name: Eric Paul Archambeau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Certified Copy]
  • February 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2020
  • July 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
February, 2020
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
July, 2019
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Corrective Entry]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.