U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standing Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 29, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.