U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Riemersma et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 11, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2021: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 23, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.