U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tuj-Solis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.