U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yanes-Salguero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 02, 2019: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.