U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schmidt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request]
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 04, 2019: [Request]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.