U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodlund
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Receipt]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 03, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 13, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 26, 2019: [Leave to]
  • December 24, 2019: [Leave to]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 09, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Request]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 15, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2019: [Request]
  • May 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 04, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.