U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bear Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 04, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 13, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Oral Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 12, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 06, 2019: [Furlough]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 08, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 15, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 09, 2019: [Request]
  • April 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 05, 2019: [Request]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 05, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.