U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Papka
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Response]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extend]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Response]
  • February 02, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.