U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flying By
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • October 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2019: [Request]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.