U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Twite
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 30, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 11, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 17, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 16, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 30, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • December 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Request]
  • December 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2019: [Request]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.