U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Charlton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 05, 2019: [Restitution Related Document]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.