U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted War Bonnet
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • December 19, 2019: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • December 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 19, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Verdict]
  • December 19, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • December 19, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • December 19, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • December 17, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 17, 2019: [Jury List]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2019: [Request]
  • October 29, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Request]
  • May 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2019: [Request]
  • May 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.