U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blue Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 11, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 11, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 11, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Request]
  • May 10, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Request]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.