U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 27, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 04, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 08, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 17, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2019: [Oral Order]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Request]
  • April 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.