U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 11, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 04, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • September 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 06, 2019: [Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Response]
  • April 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Request]
  • April 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.