U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cadotte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 05, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arrest]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.