U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaForge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • March 10, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 18, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2019: [Suppress]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Search/Search & Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 09, 2019: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 02, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Request]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.