U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 02, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 11, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 23, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2019: [Request]
  • April 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.