U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 29, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 05, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 12, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 18, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2019: [Request]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2019: [Request]
  • April 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.