U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
  • April 29, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 12, 2023: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • January 26, 2021: [Text Order]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 10, 2020: [Response]
  • December 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • November 12, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Reduce Sentence]
  • November 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.