U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 21, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 05, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sealed Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [New Trial]
  • November 06, 2019: [Acquittal]
  • November 06, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 24, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Verdict]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 22, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • October 21, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 18, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 17, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 15, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 09, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • October 09, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 09, 2019: [Objection]
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 29, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.