U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Traversie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 06, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 05, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • December 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2019: [Brief]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Request]
  • April 17, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.