U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smoke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 20, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 05, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 01, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2022: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 13, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 12, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • April 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Consent]
  • January 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 10, 2022: [Furlough]
  • January 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 04, 2022: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2022: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 09, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 06, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Consent]
  • June 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 04, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • April 21, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 22, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Bill of Particulars]
  • September 17, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 17, 2020: [Request]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 10, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 10, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 17, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.