U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Extend]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 17, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 24, 2021: [Response]
  • March 10, 2021: [Supplement]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 16, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • February 03, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extend]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [For Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • January 06, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • March 17, 2020: [Evaluation]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.