U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-50032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • June 17, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.