U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Comeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.