U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merculief
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 30, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Request]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.