U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hodges
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 10, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 10, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Request]
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • April 23, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • April 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 09, 2021: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 16, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 16, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bond Posted]
  • August 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 08, 2019: [Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Request]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 17, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.