U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaClaire
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 14, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Extend]
  • February 17, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 12, 2021: [Consent]
  • November 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 29, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 10, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 18, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2019: [Request]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.