U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conroy et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Opinion]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 17, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2019: [Supplement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 08, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Extend]
  • September 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 13, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 09, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2019: [Arrest]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 22, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 22, 2019: [Extend]
  • May 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Suppress]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [Request]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.